Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}

Archidioecesis Ianuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Angelo Bagnasco, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Nicolň Anselmi, Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Split: 16 September 1989
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 966 (373 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Liguria
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesi.genova.it/
  • Mailing Address: Arcivescovado, Piazza Matteotti 4, 16123 Genova, Italia
  • Telephone: 010.27.001
  • Fax: 010.27.00.220

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Genova
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Genova (erected)
Archdiocese of Genova
20 March 1133ElevatedDiocese of Genova Archdiocese of Genova
3 December 1892Territory LostArchdiocese of Genova Diocese of Chiavari (erected)
Archdiocese of Genova-Bobbio
30 September 1986UnitedDiocese of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano)
Archdiocese of Genova
Archdiocese of Genova-Bobbio
16 September 1989SplitArchdiocese of Genova-Bobbio
Diocese of Piacenza
Diocese of Piacenza-Bobbio
Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}
16 September 1989SplitArchdiocese of Genova-Bobbio Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Genova
1950758,422.0%6114141,0250600235ap1951
1969934,000941,64199.2%5705261,0968527693,925272ap1971
1980987,0001,038,00095.1%5525101,06292916992,750274ap1981
Archdiocese of Genova-Bobbio
Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}
1990890,313902,21398.7%505451956931106152,216278ap1991
1999784,588843,64493.0%4053737781,008164861,630278ap2000
2000773,016831,20193.0%4003497491,032184501,578278ap2001
2001773,325831,53393.0%3913387291,060214411,560278ap2002
2002752,111808,72293.0%3863277131,054214471,560278ap2003
2003690,133726,09395.0%3703126821,011234091,498278ap2004
2004775,980834,38893.0%3623096711,156234191,455278ap2005
2006671,423721,96093.0%3483076551,025294161,365278ap2007
2013690,409812,24685.0%2852685531,248313191,093278ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.6, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 May 2016