Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Innocenzo Cardinal Cibo (Cybo)

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

Administrator of Aleria

Administrator of Béziers

Administrator of Messina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1491BornGenova
23 Sep 151322.1Elevated to Cardinal
29 Sep 151322.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
13 Oct 151322.1AppointedAdministrator of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
13 Nov 151423.2ResignedAdministrator of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
May 1516¹24.7AppointedAdministrator of Torino {Turin}, Italy
11 May 151725.7AppointedAdministrator of Marseille, France
11 May 151725.7ResignedAdministrator of Torino {Turin}, Italy
26 Jun 151725.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
19 Jun 151826.8AppointedAdministrator of Aleria, France
27 Jul 151927.9AppointedAdministrator of Ventimiglia, Italy
8 Aug 151928.0ResignedAdministrator of Ventimiglia, Italy
11 May 152028.7AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
4 Jul 152028.9AppointedAdministrator of Torino {Turin}, Italy
19 Dec 152029.3ResignedAdministrator of Aleria, France
10 Oct 152635.1AppointedAdministrator of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
21 Nov 152635.2ResignedAdministrator of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
12 Jan 153038.4ResignedAdministrator of Marseille, France
20 Mar 153139.6AppointedAdministrator of Mariana, France
1 Dec 153140.3ResignedAdministrator of Mariana, France
3 Nov 153645.2AppointedAdministrator of Béziers, France
6 Feb 153846.4AppointedAdministrator of Tropea, Italy
14 Jun 153846.8AppointedAdministrator of Messina, Italy
22 Jun 154856.8ResignedAdministrator of Torino {Turin}, Italy
28 Feb 155058.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
14 Apr 155058.6DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Innocenzo Cibo (Cybo):
Cardinal Innocenzo Cibo (Cybo) (born , died ) Archbishop of Genova

  • a cardinal for 36.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Sep 1513
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 319, and Page 215
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 309

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013