Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Seniority by Bishop Ordination

Most Senior


Ordained
Bishop
YearsNameCurrent Title
24 Aug 1951 Ján Chryzostom Cardinal Korec, S.J.Bishop Emeritus of Nitra, Slovakia
25 Mar 1954 Bishop Jan van Cauwelaert, C.I.C.M.Bishop Emeritus of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
28 Aug 1955 Archbishop José de Jesús Pimiento RodriguezArchbishop Emeritus of Manizales, Colombia
9 Sep 1955 Bishop Dominik Kalata, S.J.Titular Bishop of Semta
29 Jun 1956 Archbishop George Hamilton Pearce, S.M.Archbishop Emeritus of Suva, Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)
29 Jul 1956 Fiorenzo Cardinal AngeliniPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Assistance to Health Care Workers, Roman Curia
22 Sep 1957 Archbishop José Maria PiresArchbishop Emeritus of Paraíba, Paraiba, Brazil
29 Sep 1957 Bishop Felice LeonardoBishop Emeritus of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
27 Apr 1958 Archbishop Bernardino Piñera CarvalloArchbishop Emeritus of La Serena, Chile
10 Aug 1958 Bishop Caetano Antônio Lima dos Santos, O.F.M. Cap.Bishop Emeritus of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
7 May 1959 Serafim Cardinal Fernandes de AraújoArchbishop Emeritus of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
24 Apr 1960 Archbishop Moisés Julio BlanchoudArchbishop Emeritus of Salta, Argentina
21 Jun 1960 Archbishop Arturo Antonio Szymanski RamírezArchbishop Emeritus of San Luis Potosí, México
25 Jul 1960 Bishop Eloy Tato Losada, I.E.M.E.Bishop Emeritus of Magangué, Colombia
16 Apr 1961 Bishop Mario Renato Cornejo RadaveroAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lima, Peru
22 Apr 1961 Bishop Albert-Georges-Yves MalboisBishop Emeritus of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes, France
14 May 1961 Archbishop Carlos Quintero ArceArchbishop Emeritus of Hermosillo, Sonora, México
21 May 1961 Bishop Placidus Gervasius Nkalanga, O.S.B.Bishop Emeritus of Bukoba, Tanzania
16 Jul 1961 Nasrallah Pierre Cardinal SfeirPatriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
30 Jul 1961 Giovanni Cardinal CanestriArchbishop Emeritus of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
24 Aug 1961 Bishop William John McNaughton, M.M.Bishop Emeritus of Incheon {Inch’on}, Korea (South)
8 Sep 1961 Bishop José de Jesús Sahagún de la ParraBishop Emeritus of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán, México
15 Oct 1961 Bishop Andrés Sapelak, S.D.B.Bishop Emeritus of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian), Argentina
29 Oct 1961 Archbishop Antônio Ribeiro de OliveiraArchbishop Emeritus of Goiânia, Goias, Brazil
6 Jan 1962 Bishop José Mauro Ramalho de Alarcón SantiagoBishop Emeritus of Iguatú, Ceara, Brazil
11 Feb 1962 Bishop Gregorio Garavito Jiménez, S.M.M.Bishop Emeritus of Villavicencio, Colombia
19 Mar 1962 Bishop Roberto Reinaldo Cáceres GonzálezBishop Emeritus of Melo, Uruguay
25 Jul 1962 Bishop Jacques LandriaultBishop Emeritus of Timmins, Ontario, Canada
30 Aug 1962 Archbishop Raymond Gerhardt HunthausenArchbishop Emeritus of Seattle, Washington, USA
12 Sep 1962 Bishop Myles McKeonBishop Emeritus of Bunbury, Australia
14 Dec 1962 Bishop Remi Joseph De RooBishop Emeritus of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
24 Feb 1963 Bishop Yves-Georges-René Ramousse, M.E.P.Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia
9 May 1963 Bishop Géry-Jacques-Charles LeulietBishop Emeritus of Amiens, France
29 Aug 1963 Bishop Laurent NoëlBishop Emeritus of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada
4 Oct 1963 Bishop Luigi BettazziBishop Emeritus of Ivrea, Italy
20 Oct 1963 Archbishop Victorinus Youn Kong-hiArchbishop Emeritus of Kwangju, Korea (South)
30 Jan 1964 Bishop Victor Garaygordóbil BerrizbeitiaPrelate Emeritus of Babahoyo, Ecuador
5 Feb 1964 Archbishop Alphonsus MathiasArchbishop Emeritus of Bangalore, India
13 Feb 1964 Archbishop Savino Bernardo Maria Cazzaro Bertollo, O.S.M.Archbishop Emeritus of Puerto Montt, Chile
25 Feb 1964 Bishop Andreas Peter Cornelius Sol, M.S.C.Bishop Emeritus of Amboina, Indonesia
3 Mar 1964 Bishop José Gabriel Diaz CuevaBishop Emeritus of Azogues, Ecuador
1 May 1964 Bishop Georges-Hilaire Dupont, O.M.I.Bishop Emeritus of Pala, Chad
2 Feb 1965 Archbishop Gabriel Thohey Mahn-GabyArchbishop Emeritus of Yangon, Myanmar
16 Feb 1965 Archbishop James OdongoArchbishop Emeritus of Tororo, Uganda
20 Apr 1965 Archbishop James Martin HayesArchbishop Emeritus of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
25 Jul 1965 Bishop José Trinidad Sepúlveda Ruiz-VelascoBishop Emeritus of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
22 Aug 1965 Archbishop Gabino Díaz MerchánArchbishop Emeritus of Oviedo, Spain
29 Aug 1965 Francis Cardinal ArinzePrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments, Roman Curia
5 Sep 1965 Archbishop Hilarion Capucci, B.A.Patriarchal Vicar Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
5 Sep 1965 Archbishop Grégoire HaddadArchbishop Emeritus of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
6 Mar 1966 Bishop Paul-Marie François Rousset, Ist. del PradoBishop Emeritus of Saint-Etienne, France
29 May 1966 Archbishop Boleslaw PylakArchbishop Emeritus of Lublin, Poland
1 Jun 1966 Archbishop Peter Leo GeretyArchbishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA
12 Jun 1966 Archbishop Juan Antonio Flores SantanaArchbishop Emeritus of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
3 Jul 1966 Paulo Evaristo Cardinal Arns, O.F.M.Archbishop Emeritus of São Paulo, Brazil
25 Jul 1966 Bishop Ernest Bertrand Boland, O.P.Bishop Emeritus of Multan, Pakistan
28 Aug 1966 Archbishop Pedro Antônio Marchetti FedaltoArchbishop Emeritus of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
4 Sep 1966 Bishop Jesús Agustín López de Lama, C.P.Prelate Emeritus of Corocoro, Bolivia
8 Sep 1966 Bishop Julio Xavier Labayen, O.C.D.Prelate Emeritus of Infanta, Philippines
2 Oct 1966 Archbishop Luciano José Cabral DuarteArchbishop Emeritus of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil
7 Oct 1966 Bishop Gerardo Humberto Flores ReyesBishop Emeritus of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala
6 Nov 1966 Bishop Manuel Edmilson da CruzBishop Emeritus of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil
11 Dec 1966 Bishop Albert Onyembo Lomandjo, C.S.Sp.Bishop Emeritus of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Dec 1966 Archbishop Gilberto Pereira LopesArchbishop Emeritus of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 Dec 1966 Bishop Sergio Otoniel Contreras NaviaBishop Emeritus of Temuco, Chile
21 Jan 1967 Bishop Gérard-Joseph Deschamps, S.M.M.Bishop Emeritus of Bereina, Papua New Guinea
5 Mar 1967 Archbishop Raul Nicolau GonsalvesArchbishop Emeritus of Goa e Damão, India
5 Mar 1967 Archbishop Hovhannes TcholakianArchbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey
30 Apr 1967 Bishop José Francisco Moreira dos Santos, O.F.M. Cap.Bishop Emeritus of Uije, Angola
30 Apr 1967 Bishop Jesus Y. VarelaBishop Emeritus of Sorsogon, Philippines
14 May 1967 Bishop Chucrallah HarbBishop Emeritus of Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon
17 Jun 1967 José Cardinal Freire FalcãoArchbishop Emeritus of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
17 Jun 1967 Bishop Juan Conway McNabb, O.S.A.Bishop Emeritus of Chulucanas, Peru
29 Jun 1967 Archbishop Manuel Vieira PintoArchbishop Emeritus of Nampula, Mozambique
5 Jul 1967 Archbishop Carmelo Dominador Flores MorelosArchbishop Emeritus of Zamboanga, Philippines
7 Jul 1967 Archbishop Jean-Berchmans-Marcel-Yves-Marie-Bernard Chabbert, O.F.M.Bishop Emeritus of Perpignan-Elne, France
16 Jul 1967 Loris Francesco Cardinal CapovillaPrelate Emeritus of Loreto, Italy
5 Sep 1967 Archbishop Francis Patrick CarrollArchbishop Emeritus of Canberra-Goulburn, Australia
17 Sep 1967 Bishop Lorenzo León Alvarado, O. de M.Bishop Emeritus of Huacho, Peru
15 Oct 1967 Bishop Léon Lesambo NdamwizeBishop Emeritus of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Nov 1967 Bishop Dante Frasnelli Tarter, O.S.I.Prelate Emeritus of Huarí, Peru
28 Nov 1967 Archbishop Leonard Anthony FaulknerArchbishop Emeritus of Adelaide, Australia
30 Nov 1967 Archbishop Edgerton Roland ClarkeArchbishop Emeritus of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles
12 Dec 1967 Archbishop John Raphael QuinnArchbishop Emeritus of San Francisco, California, USA
17 Dec 1967 Bishop Hubertus Cornelis Antonius ErnstBishop Emeritus of Breda, Netherlands
6 Jan 1968 Bishop José Ramiro Pellecer SamayoaAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guatemala
7 Jan 1968 Bishop Luis Armando Bambarén Gastelumendi, S.J.Bishop Emeritus of Chimbote, Peru
7 Jan 1968 Archbishop Vicente Rodrigo Cisneros DuránArchbishop Emeritus of Cuenca, Ecuador
11 Feb 1968 Bishop José da Silva ChavesBishop Emeritus of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
24 Feb 1968 Archbishop Kuriakose KunnacherryArchbishop Emeritus of Kottayam (Syro-Malabarese), India
8 Mar 1968 Bishop Ignacio Nazareno Trejos PicadoBishop Emeritus of San Isidro de El General, Costa Rica
25 Mar 1968 Bishop Jorge Scarso, O.F.M. Cap.Bishop Emeritus of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
31 Mar 1968 Miguel Cardinal Obando Bravo, S.D.B.Archbishop Emeritus of Managua, Nicaragua
1 May 1968 Bishop Thomas John GumbletonAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Detroit, Michigan, USA
11 Jun 1968 Bishop Alfred KleinermeilertAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany
12 Jun 1968 Bishop Joseph Mahn ErieBishop Emeritus of Bassein, Myanmar
29 Jun 1968 Friedrich Cardinal WetterArchbishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
17 Jul 1968 Archbishop Oswald Thomas Colman GomisArchbishop Emeritus of Colombo, Sri Lanka
12 Sep 1968 Archbishop Daniel Anthony CroninArchbishop Emeritus of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
24 Nov 1968 Archbishop Girolamo PrigioneApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to México

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 23 Oct 2014