Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Heitor de Araújo Sales

Archbishop Emeritus of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1926 BornSão José de Mipibu
3 Dec 195024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
5 May 197851.7AppointedBishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
16 Jul 197851.9Ordained BishopBishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
27 Oct 199367.2AppointedArchbishop of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
26 Nov 200377.3RetiredArchbishop of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Heitor de Araújo Sales:
Archbishop Heitor de Araújo Sales (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Natal

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Natal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015