Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Canindé Palhano

Bishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1949 Born
2 Feb 197526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
26 Jul 200657.5AppointedBishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil
21 Oct 200657.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil
3 Jan 201869.0AppointedBishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Canindé Palhano
Bishop Francisco Canindé Palhano (born ) Bishop of Petrolina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão José de Mipibu
Ordained BishopCathedral, Natal, Archdiocese of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Petrolina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,275
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 3 Jan 2018