Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Benedict XIV

Prospero Lorenzo Lambertini

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1675BornBologna
12 Jun 172449.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
16 Jul 172449.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
9 Dec 172651.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
20 Jan 172751.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ancona e Numana, Italy
30 Apr 172853.0Elevated to Cardinal
30 Apr 172853.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
30 Apr 173156.0AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
17 Aug 174065.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
22 Aug 174065.3InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
14 Jan 175478.7ResignedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
3 May 175883.0DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Prospero Lorenzo Lambertini:
Pope Prospero Lorenzo Lambertini (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 33.7 years
  • a cardinal for 13.7 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Dec 1726
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014