Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Alfonso Miroglio

Deceased

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1692Born
16 Mar 174451.8AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
22 Mar 174451.8Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
14 Apr 175461.8DiedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Alfonso Miroglio
Bishop Giuseppe Alfonso Miroglio (born , died ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCitta di Casale

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 75
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018