Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Andrea Tria

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Larino

Titular Archbishop of Tyrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1676³BornLatertia
19 Sep 169923.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 172043.6AppointedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
17 Mar 172043.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
23 Dec 172650.4AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
13 Dec 174165.3ResignedBishop of Larino, Italy
20 Dec 174165.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
16 Jan 176184.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Larino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Andrea Tria
Archbishop Giovanni Andrea Tria (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Larino

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 143, and Page 237
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 253, and Page 423
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Oct 2016