Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Cervini

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1695Born
1 Apr 172428.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 174751.4AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
11 Jun 174751.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Siena, Italy
13 Nov 177175.9DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Cervini
Archbishop Alessandro Cervini (born , died ) Archbishop of Siena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontepulciano

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 375
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018