Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Monreale

Archidioecesis Montis Regalis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Michele Pennisi, Archbishop
  • Salvatore Cassisa, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Salvatore Di Cristina, Archbishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Monreale
1176ErectedDiocese of Monreale (erected)
Archdiocese of Monreale
5 February 1183ElevatedDiocese of Monreale Archdiocese of Monreale
26 October 1937Territory LostArchdiocese of Monreale
Archdiocese of Palermo
Diocese of Piana dei Greci (erected)
2 December 2000ElevatedArchdiocese of Monreale (no longer a Metropolitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Monreale
1949199,500200,00099.8%180402209063530050ap1951
1970198,000200,00099.0%137421791,1065434277ap1971
1980211,800214,00099.0%117331501,4124730585ap1981
1990207,700224,80092.4%104431471,41258261113ap1991
1999185,000190,00097.4%107401471,258253290113ap2000
2000185,000190,00097.4%104401441,284153290113ap2001
2001185,000190,00097.4%110401501,23353290113ap2002
2002185,000190,00097.4%106391451,27549262113ap2003
2003185,000200,00092.5%107271341,380244278113ap2004*
2004185,000193,41395.7%106271331,390244278113ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 5 Jan 2014