Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Peretti di Montalto

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1595²Born
16 Dec 164146.9Elevated to Cardinal
10 Feb 164247.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
30 May 165055.4AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
7 Jun 165055.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
4 May 165560.3DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Francesco Peretti di Montalto
Francesco Cardinal Peretti di Montalto
(born 1595, died )
Archbishop of Monreale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopQuirinal Palace, Pauline, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Sixtus V Chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Relatives
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
  • a cardinal for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1641
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 249
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1650, Number 12
  • c4: AT, 18 Dec 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025