Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Innocent X

Giovanni Battista Pamphilj

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1574BornRome
19 Jan 162651.7AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
25 Jan 162651.7Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
30 May 162652.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
30 Aug 162753.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
162954.7AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
19 Nov 162955.5Elevated to Cardinal
12 Aug 163056.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
163964.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
15 Sep 164470.4ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
4 Oct 164470.4InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
7 Jan 165580.7DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Pamphilj:
Holy Father Giovanni Battista Pamphilj (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 29.0 years
  • a cardinal for 17.1 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Aug 1627
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 22, and Page 86
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 87, Number 519

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013