Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Julius II

Giuliano della Rovere

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1443BornAlbissola
16 Oct 147127.9AppointedBishop of Carpentras, France
16 Dec 147128.0Elevated to Cardinal
22 Dec 147128.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
31 Jan 147228.2AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
23 Feb 147228.2InstalledBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
13 Jan 147329.1AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
23 May 147430.5AppointedBishop of Avignon, France
21 Nov 147532.0AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
15 Jul 147632.6AppointedBishop of Coutances, France
Aug 147733.7AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
3 Dec 147734.0AppointedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
3 Jul 147834.6AppointedBishop of Mende, France
19 Apr 147935.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
1481²37.1Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
31 Jan 148339.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
Oct 1483³39.8ResignedBishop of Mende, France
3 Nov 148339.9AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
1488²44.1AppointedAdministrator of Lodève, France
Apr 1489³45.3ResignedAdministrator of Lodève, France
20 Sep 149955.8AppointedAdministrator of Savona, Italy
6 Nov 149955.9AppointedAdministrator of Lucca, Italy
29 Aug 150157.7ResignedAdministrator of Lucca, Italy
24 Jan 150258.1AppointedAdministrator of Vercelli, Italy
1 Nov 150359.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
26 Nov 150360.0InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
21 Feb 151369.2DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuliano della Rovere:
Holy Father Giuliano della Rovere (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 32.1 years
  • a cardinal for 31.9 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,623
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Dec 1471
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 330
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,882

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 11 Nov 2013