Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Catania

Archidioecesis Catanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Salvatore Gristina, Archbishop
  • Luigi Bommarito, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 4 September 1859
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,332 (514 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sicilia
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesi.catania.it/
  • Mailing Address: Arcivescovado, Via Vittorio Emanuele 159, 95131 Catania, Italia
  • Telephone: 095.71.59.062; 095.25.04.311
  • Fax: 095.25.04.358

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Catania
1st CenturyErectedDiocese of Catania (erected)
12 September 1816Territory LostDiocese of Catania
Archdiocese of Messina
Diocese of Caltagirone (erected)
17 March 1817Territory LostDiocese of Catania Diocese of Nicosia (erected)
3 July 1817Territory LostDiocese of Catania Diocese of Piazza Armerina (erected)
27 June 1844Territory LostDiocese of Catania
Archdiocese of Messina
Diocese of Acireale (erected)
Archdiocese of Catania
4 September 1859ElevatedDiocese of Catania Archdiocese of Catania
2 December 2000ElevatedArchdiocese of Catania (became a Metroplitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Catania
1949445,000450,00098.9%31118249390230391183ap1951
1959547,000555,10098.5%3002125121,0684331,311111ap1960
1969625,379.0%30923354204441,342123ap1971
1980668,803672,95399.4%2752525271,2693351,172143ap1981
1990700,000725,37096.5%2492324811,4552951,021148ap1991
1999695,000720,19896.5%2592044631,50119243838152ap2000
2000716,000731,05697.9%2641514151,72520184573152ap2001
2001716,000731,05697.9%2671514181,71220184573152ap2002
2002695,000709,68297.9%2731834561,52432215631152ap2003
2003695,000703,94698.7%2741764501,54434223658153ap2004
2004724,332733,65698.7%2661594251,70435202709154ap2005
2006724,886734,21898.7%2591414001,81234176991155ap2007
2013737,000746,99998.7%237993362,19341109379157ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.6, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 May 2016