Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Gravina Luzzena

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Catania, Italy

Titular Bishop of Akka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1763Born
24 Mar 178724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Catania, Italy
11 Jul 183673.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Catania, Italy
11 Jul 183673.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Akka
18 Sep 183673.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Akka
1855²91.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Catania, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Gravina Luzzena
Bishop Pietro Gravina Luzzena (born , died 1855) Auxiliary Bishop of Catania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatania, Diocese of Catania
Ordained BishopSan Severino dei Padri Cassinesi, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 67.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 57
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,853, Page 102
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Mar 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,836, Number 35
  • c34: AT, 23 Jun 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,732

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast