Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Scipione Cardinal Rebiba

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1504BornSan Marco d’Alunzio
16 Mar 154137.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chieti, Italy
16 Mar 154137.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyclae
14 May 154137.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyclae
12 Oct 155147.7AppointedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
20 Dec 155551.9Elevated to Cardinal
24 Jan 155652.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
13 Apr 155652.2AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
19 Jun 156056.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Troia, Italy
4 Sep 156056.6ResignedBishop of Troia, Italy
7 Feb 156561.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
8 Dec 156561.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
7 Oct 156662.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
3 Jul 157066.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
1573¹68.9ResignedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
8 Apr 157369.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
5 May 157470.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
23 Jul 157773.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Scipione Rebiba:
Cardinal Scipione Rebiba (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a bishop for 36.2 years
  • a cardinal for 21.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1555
  • ob: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,821
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 177, and Page 319
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013