Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Egidio Valenti, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Oct 1566AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
28 Oct 1566Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
9 May 1568DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Egidio Valenti
Bishop Egidio Valenti O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

EventPlace
Birth PlacePesaro, Diocese of Pesaro
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 306, and Page 307
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 10, Number 22
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018