Diocese | Type | Date Vacant | Last Bishop | Event |
Thessaloniki, Greece | Vicariate Apostolic | 15 Jul 1929 | Alessandro Guidati † | Appointed, Archbishop of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos |
Crete {Candia}, Greece | Diocese | 5 May 1935 | Lorenzo Giacomo Inglese, O.F.M. Cap. † | Appointed, Bishop of Anglona-Tursi |
Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine | Archeparchy | 4 Dec 1938 | Józef Teofil Teodorowicz † | Died |
Chios (Scio), Greece | Diocese | 1 Jul 1939 | Nikolaos Charichiopoulos (Harikoupoulos) † | Died |
Derna, Libya | Vicariate Apostolic | 21 Jun 1948 | Giovanni Lucato, S.D.B. † | Appointed, Bishop of Isernia e Venafro |
Russia (Russian) | Apostolic Exarchate | 1 May 1951 | Bl. Klymentiy Sheptytskyi, M.S.U. † | Died |
Istanbul (Constantinople) (Greek), Turkey | Apostolic Exarchate | 28 Jan 1957 | Denis Leonid Varouhas † | Died |
West Indies, Spain | Patriarchate | 31 Aug 1963 | Leopoldo Eijo y Garay † | Died, Bishop of Madrid |
Misurata, Libya | Prefecture Apostolic | 26 Jun 1969 | Guido Attilio Previtali, O.F.M. † | Appointed, Titular Bishop of Sozusa in Libya |
Rhodos {Rhodes}, Greece | Archdiocese | 10 Mar 1970 | Florido Ambrogio Acciari, O.F.M. † | Died |
Luang Prabang, Laos | Vicariate Apostolic | 29 Nov 1975 | Alessandro Staccioli, O.M.I. | Appointed, Auxiliary Bishop of Siena |
Mogadiscio, Somalia | Diocese | 9 Jul 1989 | Pietro Salvatore Colombo, O.F.M. † | Died |
Netherlands, Military | Military Ordinariate | 13 Mar 1993 | Ronald Philippe Bär, O.S.B. | Resigned |
Nuestra Señora del Paraíso en México (Melkite Greek) | Eparchy | 7 Jun 1994 | Boutros (Pierre) Raï, B.A. † | Died |
Greece (Armenian) | Ordinariate | 27 Sep 2000 | Nechan Karakéhéyan, I.C.P.B. † | Appointed, Bishop of Ispahan {Esfáan} (Armenian) |
Iraq (Melkite Greek) | Patriarchal Exarchate | 2004 | Georges El-Murr, B.C. † | Resigned |
Le Caire {Cairo} (Chaldean), Egypt | Eparchy | 31 Dec 2009 | Youssef Ibrahim Sarraf † | Died |
Ahwaz (Chaldean), Iran | Archeparchy | 10 Jun 2011 | Hanna Zora † | Appointed, Archbishop (Personal Title) of Mar Addai of Toronto (Chaldean) |
Lithuania, Military | Military Ordinariate | 5 Apr 2013 | Gintaras Linas Grušas | Appointed, Archbishop of Vilnius |
Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy | Territorial Abbey | 4 Nov 2013 | Emiliano Fabbricatore, O.S.B.I. † | Retired |
Falkland Islands o Malvinas | Prefecture Apostolic | 29 Sep 2016 | Michael Bernard McPartland, S.M.A. † | Retired |
Kenya, Military | Military Ordinariate | 30 Dec 2016 | Alfred Kipkoech Arap Rotich | Retired |
El Salvador, Military | Military Ordinariate | 7 Dec 2017 | Fabio Reynaldo Colindres Abarca | Appointed, Bishop of San Miguel |
Ahiara, Nigeria | Diocese | 19 Feb 2018 | Peter Ebere Okpaleke | Resigned |
Dromore, Ireland | Diocese | 26 Mar 2018 | John McAreavey | Resigned |
Vanuatu, Pacific (Oceania) | Nunciature | 16 Jun 2018 | Martin Krebs | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Uruguay |
Paraguay, Military | Military Ordinariate | 23 Jun 2018 | Adalberto Martínez Flores | Appointed, Bishop of Villarrica del Espíritu Santo |
Cuddapah, India | Diocese | 10 Dec 2018 | Prasad Gallela | Resigned |
Saint Vladimir-Le-Grand de Paris (Ukrainian) | Eparchy | 18 Feb 2019 | Borys Andrij Gudziak | Appointed, Archbishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania |
Karwar, India | Diocese | 1 May 2019 | Derek Fernandes | Appointed, Bishop of Belgaum |
Timika, Indonesia | Diocese | 3 Aug 2019 | John Philip Saklil † | Died |
Alaminos, Philippines | Diocese | 18 Oct 2019 | Ricardo Lingan Baccay | Appointed, Archbishop of Tuguegarao |
Bosnia and Herzegovina, Military | Military Ordinariate | 22 Jan 2020 | Tomo Vukšić | Appointed, Coadjutor Archbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo} |
Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy | Eparchy | 25 Feb 2020 | Giorgio Demetrio Gallaro | Appointed, Secretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches |
Vellore, India | Diocese | 21 Mar 2020 | Soundaraj Periyanayagam, S.D.B. † | Died |
Barquisimeto, Venezuela | Archdiocese | 25 Mar 2020 | Antonio José López Castillo † | Retired |
Arabian Peninsula | Delegation | 17 Apr 2020 | Francisco Montecillo Padilla | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Guatemala |
Yemen | Nunciature | 17 Apr 2020 | Francisco Montecillo Padilla | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Guatemala |
Kuzhithurai, India | Diocese | 6 Jun 2020 | Jerome Dhas Varuvel, S.D.B. | Resigned |
Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine | Eparchy | 14 Jul 2020 | Milan Šašik, C.M. † | Died |
Rodrigues, Mauritius | Vicariate Apostolic | 10 Sep 2020 | Alain Harel | Appointed, Bishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles |
Awasa, Ethiopia | Vicariate Apostolic | 29 Sep 2020 | Roberto Bergamaschi, S.D.B. | Appointed, Vicar Apostolic of Gambella |
Rundu, Namibia | Vicariate Apostolic | 16 Nov 2020 | Joseph Shipandeni Shikongo, O.M.I. | Resigned |
Myitkyina, Myanmar | Diocese | 18 Nov 2020 | Francis Daw Tang | Resigned |
Kurnool, India | Diocese | 19 Nov 2020 | Anthony Poola | Appointed, Archbishop of Hyderabad |
Eshowe, South Africa | Diocese | 25 Nov 2020 | Xolelo Thaddaeus Kumalo | Appointed, Bishop of Witbank |
Uganda, Military | Military Ordinariate | 4 Dec 2020 | James Odongo † | Died, Archbishop Emeritus of Tororo |
Atyrau, Kazakhstan | Apostolic Administration | 8 Dec 2020 | Dariusz Buras | Resigned |
El Banco, Colombia | Diocese | 27 Feb 2021 | Luis Gabriel Ramírez Díaz † | Appointed, Bishop of Ocaña |
San Vicente del Caguán, Colombia | Diocese | 25 Mar 2021 | Francisco Javier Múnera Correa, I.M.C. | Appointed, Archbishop of Cartagena |
Bafatá, Guinea-Bissau | Diocese | 31 Mar 2021 | Pedro Carlos Zilli, P.I.M.E. † | Died |
Ayaviri, Peru | Territorial Prelature | 7 Apr 2021 | Kay Martin Schmalhausen Panizo | Resigned |
Jhabua, India | Diocese | 6 May 2021 | Basil Bhuriya, S.V.D. † | Died |
Venezuela | Nunciature | 8 May 2021 | Aldo Giordano † | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to European Union |
Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.) | Diocese | 17 May 2021 | Joseph Banga Bane | Resigned |
Kilwa-Kasenga, Congo (Dem. Rep.) | Diocese | 22 May 2021 | Fulgence Muteba Mugalu | Appointed, Archbishop of Lubumbashi |
Australia, Military | Military Ordinariate | 24 May 2021 | Max Leroy Davis | Retired |
Brunei | Vicariate Apostolic | 29 May 2021 | Cornelius Sim † | Died |
Monrovia, Liberia | Archdiocese | 7 Jun 2021 | Lewis Jerome Zeigler † | Retired |
Illapel, Chile | Territorial Prelature | 8 Jun 2021 | Jorge Patricio Vega Velasco, S.V.D. | Appointed, Bishop of Valparaíso |
Huarí, Peru | Diocese | 11 Jun 2021 | Ivo Baldi Gaburri † | Died |
Esteli, Nicaragua | Diocese | 6 Jul 2021 | Juan Abelardo Mata Guevara, S.D.B. | Retired |
Nalgonda, India | Diocese | 31 Jul 2021 | Joji Govindu | Retired |
Holy Protection of Mary of Phoenix (Ruthenian), Arizona, USA | Eparchy | 23 Aug 2021 | John Stephen Pažak, C.SS.R. | Retired |
Broome, Australia | Diocese | 28 Aug 2021 | Christopher Alan Saunders | Resigned |
Eastern Europe {Europa Orientale} (Armenian) | Ordinariate | 23 Sep 2021 | Raphaël Bedros XXI Minassian, I.C.P.B. | Elected, Patriarch of Cilicia (Armenian) |
Khandwa, India | Diocese | 4 Oct 2021 | Alangaram Arockia Sebastian Durairaj, S.V.D. | Appointed, Archbishop of Bhopal |
Ziguinchor, Senegal | Diocese | 4 Nov 2021 | Paul Abel Mamba Diatta | Appointed, Bishop of Tambacounda |
Yokadouma, Cameroon | Diocese | 27 Nov 2021 | Paul Lontsié-Keuné | Appointed, Bishop of Bafoussam |
Purnea, India | Diocese | 8 Dec 2021 | Angelus Kujur, S.J. | Retired |
Ilorin, Nigeria | Diocese | 1 Jan 2022 | Paul Adegboyega Olawoore † | Died |
Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain | Diocese | 4 Feb 2022 | William Nolan | Appointed, Archbishop of Glasgow, Scotland |
Garzón, Colombia | Diocese | 9 Feb 2022 | Fabio Duque Jaramillo, O.F.M. † | Died |
Jesús María (del Nayar), Nayarit, México | Territorial Prelature | 11 Feb 2022 | José de Jesús González Hernández, O.F.M. | Appointed, Bishop of Chilpancingo-Chilapa, Guerrero |
Roseau, Dominica, Antilles | Diocese | 11 Feb 2022 | Gabriel Malzaire | Appointed, Archbishop of Castries, Saint Lucia |
Villarrica del Espíritu Santo, Paraguay | Diocese | 17 Feb 2022 | Adalberto Martínez Flores | Appointed, Archbishop of Asunción |
Rutana, Burundi | Diocese | 19 Feb 2022 | Bonaventure Nahimana | Appointed, Archbishop of Gitega |
Nicaragua | Nunciature | 6 Mar 2022 | Waldemar Stanisław Sommertag | Ceased |
Ban Mê Thuột, Viet Nam | Diocese | 19 Mar 2022 | Vincent Nguyễn Văn Bản | Appointed, Bishop of Hải Phòng |
Meerut, India | Diocese | 19 Mar 2022 | Francis Kalist | Appointed, Archbishop of Pondicherry and Cuddalore |
Tenancingo, México, México | Diocese | 19 Mar 2022 | Raúl Gómez González | Appointed, Archbishop of Toluca, México |
San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México | Diocese | 26 Mar 2022 | Jorge Alberto Cavazos Arizpe | Appointed, Archbishop of San Luis Potosí |
Girona, Spain | Diocese | 31 Mar 2022 | Francesc Pardo Artigas † | Died |
Ciego de Ávila, Cuba | Diocese | 7 Apr 2022 | Juan Gabriel Díaz Ruiz | Appointed, Bishop of Matanzas |
Huánuco, Peru | Diocese | 20 Apr 2022 | Neri Menor Vargas, O.F.M. | Appointed, Bishop of Carabayllo |
Quibdó, Colombia | Diocese | 25 Apr 2022 | Juan Carlos Barreto Barreto | Appointed, Bishop of Soacha |
Plymouth, England, Great Britain | Diocese | 27 Apr 2022 | Mark Anthony O’Toole | Appointed, Archbishop of Cardiff, Wales |
Saint Ephrem of Khadki (Syro-Malankara), India | Eparchy | 7 May 2022 | Thomas Antonios Valiyavilayil, O.I.C. | Appointed, Bishop of Saint John Chrysostom of Gurgaon (Syro-Malankara) |
Olomouc, Czechia | Archdiocese | 13 May 2022 | Jan Graubner | Appointed, Archbishop of Praha {Prague} |
Bolivia, Military | Military Ordinariate | 29 Jun 2022 | Fernando Bascopé Müller, S.D.B. | Resigned |
Reyes, Bolivia | Vicariate Apostolic | 7 Jul 2022 | Waldo Rubén Barrionuevo Ramírez, C.SS.R. † | Died |
São Tomé e Príncipe | Diocese | 13 Jul 2022 | Manuel António Mendes dos Santos, C.M.F. | Resigned |
Myanmar | Nunciature | 16 Jul 2022 | Paul Tschang In-Nam | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Netherlands |
Tarawa and Nauru, Kiribati, Pacific (Oceania) | Diocese | 7 Aug 2022 | Koru Tito † | Died |
Cairns, Australia | Diocese | 21 Aug 2022 | James Foley | Resigned |
Khammam, India | Diocese | 27 Aug 2022 | Paul Maipan | Retired |
Masan, Korea (South) | Diocese | 27 Aug 2022 | Constantine Bae Ki Hyen | Resigned |
Paderborn, Germany | Archdiocese | 1 Oct 2022 | Hans-Josef Becker | Resigned |
Iglesias, Italy | Diocese | 6 Oct 2022 | Giovanni Paolo Zedda | Retired |
Lugano, Switzerland | Diocese | 10 Oct 2022 | Valerio Lazzeri | Resigned |
Kwito-Bié, Angola | Diocese | 31 Oct 2022 | José Nambi † | Died |
Bamberg, Germany | Archdiocese | 1 Nov 2022 | Ludwig Schick | Resigned |
Zrenjanin, Serbia | Diocese | 5 Nov 2022 | Ladislav Nemet, S.V.D. | Appointed, Archbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo) |
Chimoio, Mozambique | Diocese | 15 Nov 2022 | João Carlos Hatoa Nunes | Appointed, Coadjutor Archbishop of Maputo |
Pilcomayo, Paraguay | Vicariate Apostolic | 18 Nov 2022 | Lucio Alfert, O.M.I. | Retired |
Morombe, Madagascar | Diocese | 19 Nov 2022 | Zygmunt Robaszkiewicz, M.S.F. | Appointed, Bishop of Mahajanga |
Valencia en Venezuela | Archdiocese | 21 Nov 2022 | Reinaldo del Prette Lissot † | Died |
Down and Connor, Ireland | Diocese | 26 Nov 2022 | Noël Treanor | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to European Union |
Wa, Ghana | Diocese | 27 Nov 2022 | Richard Kuuia Baawobr, M. Afr. † | Died |
Kroonstad, South Africa | Diocese | 12 Dec 2022 | Peter John Holiday | Resigned |
Kananga, Congo (Dem. Rep.) | Archdiocese | 21 Dec 2022 | Marcel Madila Basanguka | Resigned |
Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain | Diocese | 28 Dec 2022 | Stephen Robson | Resigned |
Duitama-Sogamoso, Colombia | Diocese | 31 Dec 2022 | Misael Vacca Ramirez | Appointed, Archbishop of Villavicencio |
Ocaña, Colombia | Diocese | 8 Jan 2023 | Luis Gabriel Ramírez Díaz † | Died |
Saint-Louis du Sénégal | Diocese | 12 Jan 2023 | Ernest Sambou | Retired |
Argentina (Melkite Greek) | Apostolic Exarchate | 14 Jan 2023 | Ibrahim Salameh, S.M.S.P. | Retired |
Apartadó, Colombia | Diocese | 25 Jan 2023 | Hugo Alberto Torres Marín | Appointed, Archbishop of Santa Fe de Antioquia |
La Ceiba, Honduras | Diocese | 26 Jan 2023 | Michael Lenihan, O.F.M. | Appointed, Archbishop of San Pedro Sula |
Chiclayo, Peru | Diocese | 30 Jan 2023 | Robert Francis Prevost, O.S.A. | Appointed, Prefect of the Dicastery for Bishops |
Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro | Diocese | 31 Jan 2023 | Ivan Štironja | Appointed, Bishop of Poreč i Pula |
Tocantinópolis, Tocatins, Brazil | Diocese | 31 Jan 2023 | Giovane Pereira de Melo | Appointed, Bishop of Araguaína, Tocatins |
Armidale, Australia | Diocese | 2 Feb 2023 | Michael Robert Kennedy | Appointed, Bishop of Maitland-Newcastle |
Tanjore, India | Diocese | 4 Feb 2023 | Devadass Ambrose Mariadoss | Retired |
Botswana | Nunciature | 8 Feb 2023 | Peter Bryan Wells | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Thailand |
Lesotho | Nunciature | 8 Feb 2023 | Peter Bryan Wells | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Thailand |
Namibia | Nunciature | 8 Feb 2023 | Peter Bryan Wells | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Thailand |
eSwatini | Nunciature | 8 Feb 2023 | Peter Bryan Wells | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Thailand |
South Africa | Nunciature | 8 Feb 2023 | Peter Bryan Wells | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Thailand |
Baguio, Philippines | Diocese | 3 Mar 2023 | Victor Barnuevo Bendico | Appointed, Archbishop of Capiz |
Gumaca, Philippines | Diocese | 16 Mar 2023 | Victor de la Cruz Ocampo † | Died |
Osnabrück, Germany | Diocese | 25 Mar 2023 | Franz-Josef Hermann Bode | Resigned |
Agaña, Guam, Pacific (Oceania) | Archdiocese | 28 Mar 2023 | Michael Jude Byrnes | Resigned |
Bubanza, Burundi | Diocese | 1 Apr 2023 | Jean Ntagwarara | Retired |
Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France | Diocese | 6 Apr 2023 | Pierre-Yves Michel | Appointed, Bishop of Nancy (-Toul) |
Laval, France | Diocese | 11 Apr 2023 | Thierry Marie Scherrer | Appointed, Bishop of Perpignan-Elne |
Moldova, Republic of | Nunciature | 13 Apr 2023 | Miguel Maury Buendía | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Great Britain |
Romania | Nunciature | 13 Apr 2023 | Miguel Maury Buendía | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Great Britain |
Vélez, Colombia | Diocese | 14 Apr 2023 | Marco Antonio Merchán Ladino | Appointed, Bishop of Neiva |
Ipil, Philippines | Diocese | 25 Apr 2023 | Julius Sullan Tonel | Appointed, Archbishop of Zamboanga |
Samoa-Apia, Pacific (Oceania) | Archdiocese | 25 Apr 2023 | Alapati Lui Mata’eliga † | Died |
Tokelau, Pacific (Oceania) | Mission "Sui Iuris" | 25 Apr 2023 | Alapati Lui Mata’eliga † | Died, Archbishop of Samoa-Apia |
Nekemte, Ethiopia | Vicariate Apostolic | 10 May 2023 | Varghese Thottamkara, C.M. | Appointed, Bishop of Balasore |
Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México | Diocese | 13 May 2023 | Gerardo Díaz Vázquez | Appointed, Bishop of Colima |
Monaco | Nunciature | 16 May 2023 | Antonio Arcari | Retired |
Mozambique | Nunciature | 18 May 2023 | Piergiorgio Bertoldi | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic |
Balanga, Philippines | Diocese | 24 May 2023 | Ruperto Cruz Santos | Appointed, Bishop of Antipolo |
Rio Grande, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil | Diocese | 24 May 2023 | Ricardo Hoepers | Appointed, Auxiliary Bishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal |
Strasbourg, France | Archdiocese | 27 May 2023 | Luc Marie Daniel Ravel, C.R.S.V. | Resigned |
Napo, Ecuador | Vicariate Apostolic | 31 May 2023 | Adelio Pasqualotto, C.S.I. | Resigned |
Jullundur, India | Diocese | 1 Jun 2023 | Franco Mulakkal (Aippunny) | Resigned |
Ambatondrazaka, Madagascar | Diocese | 5 Jun 2023 | Jean de Dieu Raoelison | Appointed, Archbishop of Antananarivo |
Miarinarivo, Madagascar | Diocese | 12 Jun 2023 | Jean Claude Randrianarisoa | Resigned |
Chanthaburi, Thailand | Diocese | 13 Jun 2023 | Silvio Siripong Charatsri | Appointed, Bishop of Ratchaburi |
Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil | Diocese | 14 Jun 2023 | Paulo Jackson Nóbrega de Sousa | Appointed, Archbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco |
Auki, Solomon Islands | Diocese | 16 Jun 2023 | Peter Houhou | Appointed, Bishop of Gizo |
Korea | Nunciature | 19 Jun 2023 | Alfred Xuereb | Resigned |
Mongolia | Nunciature | 19 Jun 2023 | Alfred Xuereb | Resigned |
Congo, Democratic Republic of | Nunciature | 21 Jun 2023 | Ettore Balestrero | Appointed, Permanent Observer to United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva |
Blois, France | Diocese | 26 Jun 2023 | Jean-Pierre Louis Roger Sylvain Batut | Resigned |
Burlington, Vermont, USA | Diocese | 26 Jun 2023 | Christopher James Coyne | Appointed, Coadjutor Archbishop of Hartford, Connecticut |
Nevers, France | Diocese | 26 Jun 2023 | Thierry Marie Jacques Brac de la Perrière | Resigned |
Knoxville, Tennessee, USA | Diocese | 27 Jun 2023 | Richard Frank Stika | Resigned |
Bunbury, Australia | Diocese | 30 Jun 2023 | Gerard Joseph Holohan | Retired |
Morocco | Nunciature | 30 Jun 2023 | Vito Rallo | Retired |
Our Lady of the Southern Cross, Australia | Personal Ordinariate | 1 Jul 2023 | Carl Leonard Reid | Resigned |
Bom Jesus da Lapa, Bahia, Brazil | Diocese | 5 Jul 2023 | João Santos Cardoso | Appointed, Archbishop of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte |
Pembroke, Ontario, Canada | Diocese | 8 Jul 2023 | Guy Desrochers, C.SS.R. | Appointed, Archbishop of Moncton, New Brunswick |
Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia | Diocese | 8 Jul 2023 | Elkin Fernando Álvarez Botero † | Died |
Costa Rica | Nunciature | 11 Jul 2023 | Bruno Musarò | Retired |
Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil | Archdiocese | 19 Jul 2023 | João José da Costa, O. Carm. | Resigned |
Zimbabwe | Nunciature | 19 Jul 2023 | Paolo Rudelli | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Colombia |
Embu, Kenya | Diocese | 22 Jul 2023 | Paul Kariuki Njiru | Appointed, Bishop of Wote |
Maintirano, Madagascar | Diocese | 22 Jul 2023 | Gustavo Bombín Espino, O.SS.T. | Appointed, Archbishop of Toliara |
Davenport, Iowa, USA | Diocese | 26 Jul 2023 | Thomas Robert Zinkula | Appointed, Archbishop of Dubuque, Iowa |
Molegbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.) | Diocese | 1 Aug 2023 | Dominique Bulamatari Kizayakana | Resigned |
Nigeria | Nunciature | 8 Aug 2023 | Antonio Guido Filipazzi | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Poland |
Portugal, Military | Military Ordinariate | 10 Aug 2023 | Rui Manuel Sousa Valério, S.M.M. | Appointed, Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon} |
Roermond, Netherlands | Diocese | 10 Aug 2023 | Hendrikus Marie Gerardus Smeets | Resigned |
Surabaya, Indonesia | Diocese | 10 Aug 2023 | Vincentius Sutikno Wisaksono † | Died |
Quelimane, Mozambique | Diocese | 11 Aug 2023 | Hilário da Cruz Massinga, O.F.M. | Appointed, Auxiliary Bishop of Inhambane |
Viviers, France | Diocese | 18 Aug 2023 | Jean-Louis Marie Balsa | Appointed, Archbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur) |
Agen, France | Diocese | 19 Aug 2023 | Hubert Marie Michel Marcel Herbreteau | Retired |
Owando, Congo | Archdiocese | 20 Aug 2023 | Victor Abagna Mossa | Retired |
Armenia | Nunciature | 30 Aug 2023 | José Avelino Bettencourt | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Cameroun |
Georgia | Nunciature | 30 Aug 2023 | José Avelino Bettencourt | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Cameroun |
Tromsø, Norway | Territorial Prelature | 31 Aug 2023 | Berislav Grgić | Resigned |
Japan | Nunciature | 1 Sep 2023 | Leo Boccardi | Retired |
Gospić-Senj, Croatia | Diocese | 8 Sep 2023 | Zdenko Križić, O.C.D. | Appointed, Archbishop of Split-Makarska |
Saint-Dié, France | Diocese | 8 Sep 2023 | Didier Norman Raymond Berthet † | Died |
Nuevo Laredo, Tamaulipas, México | Diocese | 11 Sep 2023 | Enrique Sánchez Martínez | Appointed, Bishop of Mexicali, Baja California Norte |
Baní, Dominican Republic | Diocese | 12 Sep 2023 | Victor Emilio Masalles Pere | Resigned |
Chinhoyi, Zimbabwe | Diocese | 15 Sep 2023 | Raymond Tapiwa Mupandasekwa, C.SS.R. | Appointed, Bishop of Masvingo |
Vaduz, Liechtenstein | Archdiocese | 20 Sep 2023 | Wolfgang Haas | Retired |
Ðà Nẵng, Viet Nam | Diocese | 21 Sep 2023 | Joseph Ðặng Ðức Ngân | Appointed, Coadjutor Archbishop of Huế |
Nuevo Casas Grandes, Chihuahua, México | Diocese | 21 Sep 2023 | Jesús José Herrera Quiñonez | Appointed, Bishop of Culiacán, Sinaloa |
San Pablo, Philippines | Diocese | 21 Sep 2023 | Buenaventura Malayo Famadico | Resigned |
Steubenville, Ohio, USA | Diocese | 28 Sep 2023 | Jeffrey Marc Monforton | Appointed, Auxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan |
Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil | Diocese | 4 Oct 2023 | João Aparecido Bergamasco, S.A.C. | Appointed, Bishop of Primavera do Leste-Paranatinga, Mato Grosso |
Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire | Archdiocese | 4 Oct 2023 | Joseph Yapo Aké | Resigned |
La Vega, Dominican Republic | Diocese | 7 Oct 2023 | Héctor Rafael Rodríguez Rodríguez, M.S.C. | Appointed, Archbishop of Santiago de los Caballeros |
Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil | Diocese | 11 Oct 2023 | Gregório (Leozírio) Ben Lâmed Paixão (Neto), O.S.B. | Appointed, Archbishop of Fortaleza, Ceara |
Montego Bay, Jamaica, Antilles | Diocese | 16 Oct 2023 | Burchell Alexander McPherson | Resigned |
Tenkodogo, Burkina Faso | Diocese | 16 Oct 2023 | Prosper Kontiebo, M.I. | Appointed, Archbishop of Ouagadougou |
Comayagua, Honduras | Diocese | 17 Oct 2023 | Roberto (Patrick) Camilleri Azzopardi, O.F.M. † | Died |
Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina | Diocese | 19 Oct 2023 | Joaquín Gimeno Lahoz | Retired |
Tarlac, Philippines | Diocese | 23 Oct 2023 | Enrique de Vera Macaraeg † | Died |
Sosnowiec, Poland | Diocese | 24 Oct 2023 | Grzegorz Kaszak | Resigned |
Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile | Archdiocese | 25 Oct 2023 | Fernando Natalio Chomalí Garib | Appointed, Archbishop of Santiago de Chile |
Huesca, Spain | Diocese | 31 Oct 2023 | Julián Ruiz Martorell | Appointed, Bishop of Sigüenza-Guadalajara |
Jaca, Spain | Diocese | 31 Oct 2023 | Julián Ruiz Martorell | Appointed, Bishop of Sigüenza-Guadalajara |
San Felipe, Venezuela | Diocese | 31 Oct 2023 | Victor Hugo Basabe | Appointed, Archbishop of Coro |
Catanduva, Sao Paulo, Brazil | Diocese | 1 Nov 2023 | Valdir Mamede | Resigned |
Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina, Brazil | Diocese | 1 Nov 2023 | Onécimo Alberton | Appointed, Auxiliary Bishop of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina |
Itacoatiara, Amazonas, Brazil | Territorial Prelature | 3 Nov 2023 | José Ionilton Lisboa de Oliveira, S.D.V. | Appointed, Prelate of Marajó, Para |
Floriano, Piaui, Brazil | Diocese | 8 Nov 2023 | Edivalter Andrade | Appointed, Bishop of Parnaíba, Piaui |
Juazeiro, Bahia, Brazil | Diocese | 8 Nov 2023 | Carlos Alberto Breis Pereira, O.F.M. | Appointed, Coadjutor Archbishop of Maceió, Alagoas |
Tyler, Texas, USA | Diocese | 11 Nov 2023 | Joseph Edward Strickland | Removed |
Papua New Guinea | Nunciature | 17 Nov 2023 | Fermín Emilio Sosa Rodríguez | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Bolivia |
Solomon Islands | Nunciature | 17 Nov 2023 | Fermín Emilio Sosa Rodríguez | Appointed, Apostolic Nuncio to Bolivia |
Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil | Diocese | 18 Nov 2023 | Francisco de Sales Alencar Batista, O. Carm. | Appointed, Bishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte |
Ende, Indonesia | Archdiocese | 19 Nov 2023 | Vincentius Sensi Potokota † | Died |
Châlons, France | Diocese | 21 Nov 2023 | François Marie Pierre Touvet | Appointed, Coadjutor Bishop of Fréjus-Toulon |
Soddo, Ethiopia | Vicariate Apostolic | 23 Nov 2023 | Tsegaye Keneni Derara | Retired |
Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas, México | Archdiocese | 25 Nov 2023 | Fabio Martínez Castilla † | Died |
Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany | Diocese | 4 Dec 2023 | Gebhard Fürst | Retired |
Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar), India | Archdiocese | 7 Dec 2023 | George Alencherry | Retired |
São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil | Diocese | 7 Dec 2023 | José Carlos Brandão Cabral | Resigned |