Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ciudad Juárez

Dioecesis Civitatis Iuarezensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 10 April 1957
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Chihuahua
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Chihuahua
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 29,639 (11,448 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte
  • Web Site: http://www.diocesisdecdjuarez.org/
  • Mailing Address: Casa de Gobierno Eclesiastico, Apartado 188, Calles Mejia y Perú, 32000 Ciudad Juárez, Chih., México
  • Telephone: (656)615-09-82
  • Fax: 615-00-24

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
10 April 1957ErectedDiocese of Chihuahua Diocese of Ciudad Juárez (erected)
25 April 1966Territory LostArchdiocese of Chihuahua
Diocese of Ciudad Juárez
Diocese of Ciudad Obregón
Territorial Prelature of Madera (erected)
13 April 1977Territory LostDiocese of Ciudad Juárez Territorial Prelature of Nuevo Casas Grandes (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966565,000618,00091.4%4218609,4161817030ap1967
1970513,000533,09796.2%4111529,8651719324ap1971
1976897,000966,00092.9%47125915,2031816225ap1977
1980860,000890,00096.6%4495316,2261615121ap1981
19901,047,0001,195,00087.6%49186715,6262612637ap1991
19991,750,0002,500,00070.0%69299817,8573718655ap2000
20002,000,0002,700,00074.1%68319920,20243917458ap2001
20012,300,0003,000,00076.7%843411819,491104317659ap2002
20022,370,0003,100,00076.5%823711919,915105017063ap2003
20032,380,0002,800,00085.0%813711820,169135120265ap2004
20042,125,0002,500,00085.0%803811818,008145316366ap2005
20062,179,0002,564,00085.0%873712417,572125716268ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 7 Dec 2011