Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Renato Ascencio León

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Juárez, Chihuahua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1939 BornLeón
12 Jun 196526.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 198849.1AppointedPrelate of Madera, Chihuahua, México
30 Aug 198849.3Ordained BishopPrelate of Madera, Chihuahua, México
7 Oct 199455.4AppointedBishop of Ciudad Juárez, Chihuahua, México
20 Dec 201475.6RetiredBishop of Ciudad Juárez, Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for Renato Ascencio León:
Bishop Renato Ascencio León (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Juárez

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad Juárez.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,237
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 22 Dec 2014