Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Girolamo Prigione

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to México

Titular Archbishop of Lauriacum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1921 BornCastellazzo Bormida
18 May 194422.5Ordained PriestPriest of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
27 Aug 196846.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lauriacum
27 Aug 196846.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to El Salvador
27 Aug 196846.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guatemala
24 Nov 196847.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Lauriacum
2 Oct 197351.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Ghana
2 Oct 197351.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Nigeria
28 Apr 197654.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Nigeria
7 Feb 197856.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to México
12 Oct 199271.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to México
2 Apr 199775.4RetiredApostolic Nuncio to México

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Prigione:
Archbishop Girolamo Prigione (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of México

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to México.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 20 Dec 2014