Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Reynoso Cervantes

Deceased

Bishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos


from the Diocese of Cuernavaca Web Site

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1926BornAzcapotzalco
9 Apr 195023.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 197851.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
13 Apr 197851.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae Calanae
31 May 197851.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae Calanae
15 Jul 198255.8AppointedBishop of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora, México
17 Aug 198760.9AppointedBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
24 Oct 198761.1InstalledBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
20 Dec 200074.2DiedBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México

MicroData Summary for Luis Reynoso Cervantes:
Bishop Luis Reynoso Cervantes (born , died ) Bishop of Cuernavaca

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013