Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Hyacinthe-Sigismond Cardinal Gerdil, B. †

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1718BornSamoëns, Switzerland
25 Sep 173517.2Solemn ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
4 Jun 174122.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
11 Jun 174122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
17 Feb 177758.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
2 Mar 177758.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
23 Jun 177759.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
15 Dec 177759.4Elevated to Cardinal
30 Mar 177859.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
Feb 1779³60.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
20 Sep 178466.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
27 Feb 179576.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
12 Aug 180284.1DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hyacinthe-Sigismond Gerdil
Hyacinthe-Sigismond Cardinal Gerdil B. (born , died ) Prefect of Propagation of the Faith

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
  • a cardinal for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jun 1777
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016