Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Pellegrini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nicastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1736BornLongobardi
19 Sep 176125.1Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 179761.3SelectedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
29 Jan 179861.5ConfirmedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
2 Feb 179861.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
12 May 181881.8ResignedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
13 Mar 182285.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Nicastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Pellegrini
Bishop Carlo Pellegrini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nicastro

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 306
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 8 Mar 2016