Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simone de Magistris, C.O. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1728Born
22 Nov 176032.7ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
18 Dec 176234.8Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
27 Feb 179263.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
4 Mar 179264.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
6 Oct 180274.6DiedTitular Bishop of Cyrene

MicroData Summary for Simone de Magistris
Bishop Simone de Magistris C.O. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Cyrene

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSezze

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 191
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017