Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Leonardo Cardinal Antonelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1730BornSenigallia, Italy
24 Apr 177544.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
24 Apr 177544.5Elevated to Cardinal
2 May 178049.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
25 Jun 178453.6ResignedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
21 Feb 179463.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
21 Feb 179463.3AppointedBishop of Palestrina, Italy
19 Mar 179463.4Ordained BishopBishop of Palestrina, Italy
27 Feb 179564.3AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
2 Apr 180069.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
2 Apr 180069.4AppointedBishop of Porto e Santa Rufina, Italy
180170.2AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
3 Aug 180776.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
3 Aug 180776.7AppointedBishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
23 Jan 181180.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Antonelli:
Leonardo Cardinal Antonelli (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
  • a cardinal for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Apr 1775

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014