Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortunato Maria Pinchetti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amelia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1748Born
17 Jan 177324.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Jan 177324.9Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 180658.1AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
7 Apr 180658.1Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
17 Dec 182779.8ResignedBishop of Amelia, Italy
29 Jul 183486.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Amelia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fortunato Maria Pinchetti
Bishop Fortunato Maria Pinchetti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amelia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1806, Number 2
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018