Ordained Priest | Years | Name | Current Title |
26 May 1946 |
| Bishop José de Jesús Sahagún de la Parra | Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán, México |
27 Jul 1947 |
| Archbishop Settimio Todisco | Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi-Ostuni, Italy |
27 Mar 1948 |
| Archbishop Angelo Acerbi | Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Netherlands |
22 May 1948 |
| Archbishop Gaetano Bonicelli | Archbishop Emeritus of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino, Italy |
5 Dec 1948 |
| Bishop Manuel Edmilson da Cruz | Bishop Emeritus of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil |
6 Feb 1949 |
| Bishop Albert Jean Charles Ghislain Houssiau | Bishop Emeritus of Liège (Luik, Lüttich), Belgium |
2 Apr 1949 |
| Bishop Emanuele Catarinicchia | Bishop Emeritus of Mazara del Vallo, Italy |
20 Nov 1949 |
| Bishop José Agustín Valbuena Jáuregui | Bishop Emeritus of Valledupar, Colombia |
14 Dec 1949 |
| Archbishop Gilberto Pereira Lopes | Archbishop Emeritus of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil |
6 Jan 1950 |
| Archbishop Alberto Tricarico | Official Emeritus of the Secretariat of State, Roman Curia |
19 Feb 1950 |
| Bishop Daniel Alphonse Omer Verstraete, O.M.I. | Bishop Emeritus of Klerksdorp, South Africa |
20 Mar 1950 |
| Archbishop Victorinus Youn Kong-hi | Archbishop Emeritus of Gwangju, Korea (South) |
25 Jun 1950 |
| Bishop Julian Andrzej Wojtkowski | Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warmia, Poland |
29 Jun 1950 |
| Archbishop Edoardo Rovida | Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal |
3 Dec 1950 |
| Archbishop Heitor de Araújo Sales | Archbishop Emeritus of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil |
17 Dec 1950 |
| Bishop Domenico Crescentino Marinozzi, O.F.M. Cap. | Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Soddo-Hosanna, Ethiopia |
1951 |
| Bishop Thomas Zhao Duomo (Zhao Kexun) | Bishop of Xuanhua [Süanhwa], China |
29 Mar 1951 |
| Jānis Cardinal Pujats | Archbishop Emeritus of Riga, Latvia |
1 Apr 1951 |
| Bishop Serafín Luis Alberto Cartagena Ocaña, O.F.M. | Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zamora en Ecuador |
29 Jun 1951 |
| Bishop Raúl Holguer López Mayorga | Bishop Emeritus of Latacunga, Ecuador |
22 Jul 1951 |
| Bishop Vincenzo Rimedio | Bishop Emeritus of Lamezia Terme, Italy |
2 Dec 1951 |
| Bishop Hildebrando Mendes Costa | Bishop Emeritus of Estância, Sergipe, Brazil |
16 Dec 1951 |
| Bishop Kazimierz Romaniuk | Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa-Praga, Poland |
16 Dec 1951 |
| Archbishop Pier Giuliano Tiddia | Archbishop Emeritus of Oristano, Italy |
8 Mar 1952 |
| Bishop Ignacio Nazareno Trejos Picado | Bishop Emeritus of San Isidro de El General, Costa Rica |
29 Mar 1952 |
| Luis Pascual Cardinal Dri, O.F.M. Cap. | Priest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin |
29 Mar 1952 |
| Bishop Jacques Marie Sébastien de Saint-Blanquat | Bishop Emeritus of Montauban, France |
1 May 1952 |
| Bishop Raymond Emil Goedert | Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chicago, Illinois, USA |
7 Jun 1952 |
| Bishop Angelo Mascheroni | Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}, Italy |
24 Jun 1952 |
| Bishop Jacques Joseph Marie Despierre, Ist. del Prado | Bishop Emeritus of Carcassonne, France |
25 Jul 1952 |
| Bishop Ernst Franz Gerd Werner Dicke | Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Aachen, Germany |
25 Jul 1952 |
| Bishop Vincenzo Zarri | Bishop Emeritus of Forli-Bertinoro, Italy |
20 Dec 1952 |
| Bishop Robert Joseph Banks | Bishop Emeritus of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA |
20 Dec 1952 |
| Archbishop Daniel Anthony Cronin | Archbishop Emeritus of Hartford, Connecticut, USA |
20 Dec 1952 |
| Alexandre Cardinal do Nascimento | Archbishop Emeritus of Luanda, Angola |
24 Jan 1953 |
| Bishop John Stephen Cummins | Bishop Emeritus of Oakland, California, USA |
24 Feb 1953 |
| Bishop Klaus Dick | Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany |
30 May 1953 |
| Bishop Dominic Anthony Marconi | Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA |
30 May 1953 |
| Bishop Daniel Patrick Reilly | Bishop Emeritus of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA |
30 May 1953 |
| Bishop Joseph Martin Sartoris | Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, California, USA |
5 Jun 1953 |
| Bishop Louis Edward Gelineau | Bishop Emeritus of Providence, Rhode Island, USA |
7 Jun 1953 |
| Bishop Endre Gyulay | Bishop Emeritus of Szeged-Csanád, Hungary |
7 Jun 1953 |
| Bishop István Katona | Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Eger, Hungary |
28 Jun 1953 |
| Salvatore Cardinal De Giorgi | Archbishop Emeritus of Palermo, Italy |
28 Jun 1953 |
| Archbishop Patricio Infante Alfonso | Archbishop Emeritus of Antofagasta, Chile |
29 Jun 1953 |
| Bishop Giuseppe Di Falco | Bishop Emeritus of Sulmona-Valva, Italy |
29 Jun 1953 |
| Bishop René Marie Albert Dupont, M.E.P. | Bishop Emeritus of Andong, Korea (South) |
29 Jun 1953 |
| Archbishop James Hector MacDonald, C.S.C. | Archbishop Emeritus of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada |
29 Jun 1953 |
| Bishop Victor Manuel Maldonado Barreno, O.F.M. | Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guayaquil, Ecuador |
29 Jun 1953 |
| Bishop Juan Luis Ysern de Arce | Bishop Emeritus of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile |
19 Jul 1953 |
| Archbishop Francesco Cuccarese | Archbishop Emeritus of Pescara-Penne, Italy |
26 Jul 1953 |
| Walter Cardinal Brandmüller | President Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other |
22 Aug 1953 |
| Bishop Paul Kim Tchang-ryeol | Bishop Emeritus of Cheju, Korea (South) |
19 Sep 1953 |
| Bishop Paolo Gillet | Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Albano, Italy |
10 Oct 1953 |
| Friedrich Cardinal Wetter | Archbishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany |
6 Dec 1953 |
| Archbishop Pedro Antônio Marchetti Fedalto | Archbishop Emeritus of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil |
8 Dec 1953 |
| Bishop Benedito Francisco de Albuquerque | Bishop Emeritus of Itapipoca, Ceara, Brazil |
8 Dec 1953 |
| Bishop Walter Ivan de Azevedo, S.D.B. | Bishop Emeritus of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil |
10 Jan 1954 |
| Bishop José Geraldo Oliveira do Valle, C.S.S. | Bishop Emeritus of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil |
2 May 1954 |
| Archbishop Blasco Francisco Collaço | Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to South Africa |
12 Jun 1954 |
| Bishop Rafael de la Barra Tagle, S.V.D. | Prelate Emeritus of Illapel, Chile |
27 Jun 1954 |
| Bishop José Agustín Ganuza García, O.A.R. | Prelate Emeritus of Bocas del Toro, Panama |
27 Jun 1954 |
| Bishop Victorio Oliver Domingo | Bishop Emeritus of Orihuela-Alicante, Spain |
4 Jul 1954 |
| Bishop Melchior Shi Hongzhen | Bishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China |
21 Jul 1954 |
| Bishop Owen John Dolan | Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Palmerston North, New Zealand |
27 Jul 1954 |
| Archbishop Francis Patrick Carroll | Archbishop Emeritus of Canberra-Goulburn, Australia |
1 Aug 1954 |
| Bishop Serafim de Sousa Ferreira e Silva | Bishop Emeritus of Leiria-Fátima, Portugal |
24 Aug 1954 |
| Archbishop Alphonsus Mathias | Archbishop Emeritus of Bangalore, India |
18 Sep 1954 |
| Bishop Miguel Caviedes Medina | Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, Chile |
26 Sep 1954 |
| Archbishop Peter Chung Hoan Ting | Archbishop Emeritus of Kuching, Malaysia |
17 Oct 1954 |
| Archbishop Denys Raboula Antoine Beylouni | Curial Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon |
17 Oct 1954 |
| Archbishop Athanase Matti Shaba Matoka | Archbishop Emeritus of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq |
17 Oct 1954 |
| Bishop Flavien Joseph Melki | Curial Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon |
31 Oct 1954 |
| Bishop Juan de Dios Caballero Reyes | Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Durango, México |
5 Dec 1954 |
| Archbishop Armando Dini | Archbishop Emeritus of Campobasso-Boiano, Italy |
7 Dec 1954 |
| Bishop Jean Marie Louis Bonfils, S.M.A. | Bishop Emeritus of Nice, France |
8 Dec 1954 |
| Archbishop Edvaldo Gonçalves Amaral, S.D.B. | Archbishop Emeritus of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil |
8 Dec 1954 |
| Estanislao Esteban Cardinal Karlic | Archbishop Emeritus of Paraná, Argentina |
8 Dec 1954 |
| Camillo Cardinal Ruini | Vicar General Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy |
18 Dec 1954 |
| Paul Joseph Jean Cardinal Poupard | President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Culture, Roman Curia |
19 Mar 1955 |
| Bishop Giuseppe Malandrino | Bishop Emeritus of Noto, Italy |
26 Mar 1955 |
| Bishop Adélio Giuseppe (José) Tomasin, P.S.D.P. | Bishop Emeritus of Quixadá, Ceara, Brazil |
9 Apr 1955 |
| Bishop Paul-Marie Joseph André Guillaume | Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Dié, France |
29 May 1955 |
| Bishop Giulio Sanguineti | Bishop Emeritus of Brescia, Italy |
12 Jun 1955 |
| Bishop David Cremin | Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sydney, Australia |
26 Jun 1955 |
| Bishop Héctor Luis Lucas Peña Gómez | Bishop Emeritus of Holguín, Cuba |
29 Jun 1955 |
| Bishop Kamal Hanna Bathish | Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine |
29 Jun 1955 |
| Bishop Fritz Lobinger | Bishop Emeritus of Aliwal, South Africa |
29 Jun 1955 |
| Patriarch Michel Sabbah | Patriarch Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine |
3 Jul 1955 |
| Archbishop Carmelo Ferraro | Archbishop Emeritus of Agrigento, Italy |
6 Aug 1955 |
| Bishop Bernhard Franz Kühnel Langer, M.S.C. | Prelate Emeritus of Caravelí, Peru |
7 Aug 1955 |
| Julián Cardinal Herranz Casado | President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Legislative Texts, Roman Curia |
7 Aug 1955 |
| Bishop Szilárd Keresztes | Bishop Emeritus of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary |
15 Aug 1955 |
| Archbishop Giuseppe Costanzo | Archbishop Emeritus of Siracusa, Italy |
2 Sep 1955 |
| Bishop Jean-Baptiste Bùi Tuần | Bishop Emeritus of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam |
18 Sep 1955 |
| Archbishop Hubert Marie Pierre Dominique Barbier | Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges, France |
21 Nov 1955 |
| Archbishop Boutros Mouallem, S.M.S.P. | Archbishop Emeritus of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel |
4 Dec 1955 |
| Archbishop Domingo Salvador Castagna | Archbishop Emeritus of Corrientes, Argentina |
8 Dec 1955 |
| Bishop José da Silva Chaves | Bishop Emeritus of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil |
17 Dec 1955 |
| Bishop Ramón Buxarrais Ventura | Bishop Emeritus of Málaga, Spain |