Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Armando Dini

Archbishop Emeritus of Campobasso-Boiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1932 BornMilano
5 Dec 195422.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 199057.9AppointedBishop of Avezzano, Italy
9 Sep 199058.1Ordained BishopBishop of Avezzano, Italy
21 Nov 199866.3AppointedArchbishop of Campobasso-Boiano, Italy
8 Nov 200775.3RetiredArchbishop of Campobasso-Boiano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Armando Dini:
Archbishop Armando Dini (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Campobasso-Boiano

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Campobasso-Boiano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,593
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013