Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Valentinetti

Archbishop of Pescara-Penne, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1952 Born
25 Jun 197724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lanciano-Ortona, Italy
25 Mar 200047.6AppointedBishop of Termoli-Larino, Italy
20 May 200047.7Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli-Larino, Italy
4 Nov 200553.2AppointedArchbishop of Pescara-Penne, Italy
19 Dec 200553.3InstalledArchbishop of Pescara-Penne, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Valentinetti
Archbishop Tommaso Valentinetti (born ) Archbishop of Pescara-Penne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrtona

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Pescara-Penne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2005
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,769

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast