Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gianfranco De Luca

Bishop of Termoli-Larino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1949 BornAtri
24 Aug 197425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Teramo-Atri, Italy
22 Apr 200656.6AppointedBishop of Termoli-Larino, Italy
23 Jun 200656.8Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli-Larino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gianfranco De Luca:
Bishop Gianfranco De Luca (born ) Bishop of Termoli-Larino

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Termoli-Larino.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,171

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013