Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jan Maurycy Pawel Cardinal Puzyna z Kosielsko

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Vitale, Valeria, Gervasio e Protasio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1842BornGwoździec
1 Dec 187836.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Przemyśl, Poland
8 Dec 187836.2Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
26 Feb 188643.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
26 Feb 188643.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Memphis
25 Mar 188643.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Memphis
22 Jan 189552.4AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
15 Apr 190158.6Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jun 190259.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Vitale, Valeria, Gervasio e Protasio
8 Sep 191169.0DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Maurycy Pawel Puzyna z Kosielsko:
Cardinal Jan Maurycy Pawel Puzyna z Kosielsko (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
  • a cardinal for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 229, and Page 379
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1901

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013