Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacob Glazer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Titular Bishop of Gabala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1836Born
14 Aug 185822.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Przemyśl, Poland
30 Nov 185822.4Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
4 Sep 188751.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
4 Sep 188751.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gabala
23 Oct 188751.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gabala
1898¹61.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacob Glazer
Bishop Jacob Glazer (born , died 1898) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWola Jasiencia, Diocese of Przemyśl
Ordained BishopCathedral, Przemyśl, Diocese of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 279
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017