Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Łukasz Solecki

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1827Born
18 Oct 185023.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Nov 185023.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 188154.2SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
27 Mar 188254.6ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
14 May 188254.7Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
2 Mar 190072.5DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Łukasz Solecki (VIAF: 165032315)
Bishop Łukasz Solecki (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIawcze
Ordained BishopCathedral, Przemyśl, Diocese of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 469
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017