Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Julian Kuiłovskyi

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1826Born
1 Apr 185427.9Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
26 Jun 189064.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
26 Jun 189064.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
17 Aug 189064.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
3 Aug 189165.2SelectedBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
22 Sep 189165.3ConfirmedBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
19 Jun 189973.1AppointedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
4 May 190074.0DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Julian Kuiłovskyi
Archbishop Julian Kuiłovskyi (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoniuszki Królewskie, Diocese of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
Ordained BishopSt. Jean Baptiste, Cathedral, Przemyśl, Diocese of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 302, and Page 340
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 527
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017