Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mihály Emánuel Olsavszky, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian)

Titular Bishop of Rhosus

Member of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1697²BornOlshcvicyz
1725²28.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
1743¹46.0ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
12 Mar 174346.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
5 Sep 174346.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
9 Dec 1743³46.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
5 Nov 176770.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mihály Emánuel Olsavszky
Bishop Mihály Emánuel Olsavszky O.S.B.M. (born 1697, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács)

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 357
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 42
  • c1: CB, 1 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Jun 2016