Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Meletius Kovács

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

Titular Bishop of Tegea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1707¹Born
29 Jun 173427.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 174841.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
16 Sep 174841.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tegea
16 Sep 174841.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tegea
11 Apr 177568.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Meletius Kovács:
Bishop Meletius Kovács (born 1707, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,121
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 395, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015