Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

Dioecesis Magnovaradinensis Latinorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • László Bőcskei, Bishop
  • József Tempfli, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 18 October 1982
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bucarest {Bucureşti}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Romania
  • Square Kilometers: 12,152 (4,693 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.varad.org/
  • Mailing Address: Sirul Canonicilor 7, Cas. post. 14, RO-3700 Oradea, Romania
  • Telephone: (059)411.180

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}
1077ErectedDiocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} (erected)
Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}
5 June 1930UnitedDiocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}
Diocese of Satu Mare {Szatmár}
Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}
Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}
28 June 1941SplitDiocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár} Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}
Diocese of Satu Mare {Szatmár}
Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}
9 April 1948UnitedDiocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}
Diocese of Satu Mare {Szatmár}
Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}
Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}
18 October 1982SplitDiocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár} Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}
Diocese of Satu Mare {Szatmár}

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}
1984111,2851,015,09011.0%685731,52468055ap1991
1999108,6821,014,70510.7%694731,48844958ap2000
2000108,2971,014,70510.7%704741,46345358ap2001
2001108,0121,014,42010.6%714751,44044758ap2002
2002107,6091,014,42010.6%753781,37944358ap2003
2003107,2111,014,42010.6%633661,62477858ap2004
2004106,8271,014,42010.5%644681,57087958ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Apr 2014