Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferenc Cserháti

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest

Titular Bishop of Centuria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1947 BornTúrterebes
18 Apr 197124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
15 Jun 200760.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
15 Jun 200760.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuria
15 Aug 200760.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centuria

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Cserháti:
Bishop Ferenc Cserháti (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Esztergom-Budapest.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,490

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013