Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Péter Cardinal Erdő

Archbishop of Esztergom-Budapest

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1952 BornBudapest
18 Jun 197523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
5 Nov 199947.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
5 Nov 199947.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Puppi
6 Jan 200047.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Puppi
7 Dec 200250.5AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
11 Jan 200350.5InstalledArchbishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
21 Oct 200351.3Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200351.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
9 Mar 200451.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina

MicroData Summary for Péter Erdő:
Cardinal Péter Erdő (born ) Archbishop of Esztergom-Budapest

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Esztergom-Budapest.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,668

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013