Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Camillo Cardinal Di Pietro

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1806Born
2 Jun 183933.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Jun 183933.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jul 183933.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Berytus
14 Jul 183933.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Berytus
27 Jul 183933.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sicily, Italy
7 Feb 184438.0AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Portugal
24 Sep 184741.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
19 Dec 185347.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
16 Jun 185650.4Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jun 185650.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
Dec 185852.8AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
15 Apr 185953.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
10 Aug 185953.5AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
29 Aug 186357.6AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
1867²60.9ResignedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
20 Sep 186761.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
12 Mar 187771.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
28 Mar 187872.2AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
15 Jul 187872.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
6 Mar 188478.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camillo Di Pietro (VIAF: 89029889)
Camillo Cardinal Di Pietro (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSs. Domenico e Sisto, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 44.6 years
  • a cardinal for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 110
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 43, and Page 44
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 48, and Page 62
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1839, Number 11
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1853
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 176, and Page 213, and Page 214

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast