Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Martins Manso

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1793BornBemposta
23 Dec 182027.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 Dec 184956.0SelectedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
20 May 185056.5ConfirmedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
8 Sep 185056.8Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
18 Mar 185864.3AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
1 Dec 187885.0DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel Martins Manso:
Bishop Manuel Martins Manso (born , died ) Bishop of Guarda

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 256, and Page 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013