Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Funchal

Dioecesis Funchalensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 3 July 1551
  • Metropolitan: Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Portugal
  • Square Kilometers: 800 (309 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://diocesedofunchal.pt/
  • Mailing Address: Camara Eclesiastica, C.P. 4550, Largo Conde Ribeiro Real 49, 9001-801 Funchal CODEX, Ilha da Madeira, Portugal
  • Telephone: 291.74.13.37
  • Fax: 291.74.13.57

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Funchal
12 January 1514ErectedDiocese of Funchal (erected)
31 January 1533Territory LostDiocese of Funchal Diocese of Santiago de Cabo Verde (erected)
Archdiocese of Funchal
31 January 1533ElevatedDiocese of Funchal Archdiocese of Funchal
3 November 1534Territory LostArchdiocese of Funchal Diocese of Angra (erected)
3 November 1534Territory LostArchdiocese of Funchal Diocese of São Tomé e Príncipe (erected)
Diocese of Funchal
3 July 1551ElevatedArchdiocese of Funchal Diocese of Funchal (from Archdiocese to Diocese)
1763Territory LostDiocese of Funchal Prefecture Apostolic of Sénégal (erected)
22 January 1842Territory LostDiocese of Funchal
Diocese of São Tomé e Príncipe
Prefecture Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone} (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Funchal
1948247,797250,12499.1%107121192,0822939250ap1951
1970269,100270,20099.6%121261471,83046497102ap1971
1980270,000300,00090.0%99291282,109158566102ap1981
1990297,000320,00092.8%79301092,724356481102ap1991
1999277,000285,00097.2%76301062,61324544096ap2000
2000279,000287,70097.0%77351122,49124843096ap2001
2001279,000288,00096.9%76301062,63234537196ap2002
2002280,000292,00095.9%76271032,71854236096ap2003
2003280,000292,00095.9%72301022,74536628096ap2004
2004280,000292,00095.9%75281032,71824828096ap2005
2006270,000282,00095.7%72321042,59624924096ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Jul 2014