Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo Joaquim Bernardino de Brito

Deceased

Bishop of Funchal, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1757Born
22 Dec 178124.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Apr 181860.6SelectedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
23 Aug 181962.0ConfirmedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
27 Dec 181962.3Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
26 Jul 182062.9DiedBishop of Funchal, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Joćo Joaquim Bernardino de Brito
Bishop Joćo Joaquim Bernardino de Brito (born , died ) Bishop of Funchal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMattosinhos

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for .5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 199
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,819, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast