Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Oldest Bishops


BirthdateAgeNameCurrent Title
22 Sep 1915 Archbishop Bernardino Piñera CarvalloArchbishop Emeritus of La Serena, Chile
12 Feb 1916 Bishop Damián Iguacén BorauBishop Emeritus of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
27 Oct 1918 Bishop Gérard Tremblay, P.S.S.Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Montréal, Québec, Canada
24 Nov 1918 Father Jerzy Jan Tomziński, O.S.P.P.E.Prior General Emeritus of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
19 Jun 1919 Bishop Gérard DionneBishop Emeritus of Edmundston, New Brunswick, Canada
23 Aug 1919 Bishop Phocas NikwigizeBishop Emeritus of Ruhengeri, Rwanda
1 Nov 1919 Bishop Aldo Mongiano, I.M.C.Bishop Emeritus of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil
16 Nov 1919 Bishop Georges-Hilaire Dupont, O.M.I.Bishop Emeritus of Pala, Chad
19 Mar 1920 Bishop Laurent NoëlBishop Emeritus of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada
14 Apr 1920 Bishop Antônio Afonso de Miranda, S.D.N.Bishop Emeritus of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil
1 Feb 1921 Bishop Francisco Raúl Villalobos PadillaBishop Emeritus of Saltillo, Coahuila, México
7 Sep 1921 Bishop Linus Nirmal Gomes, S.J.Bishop Emeritus of Baruipur, India
13 Sep 1921 Bishop Odore Joseph GendronBishop Emeritus of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
1 Jan 1922 Bishop José de Jesús Sahagún de la ParraBishop Emeritus of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán, México
15 Feb 1922 Bishop Jožef SmejAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Maribor, Slovenia
20 Apr 1922 Bishop Dante BerniniBishop Emeritus of Albano, Italy
4 May 1922 Bishop Giovanni Paolo Gibertini, O.S.B.Bishop Emeritus of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla, Italy
26 Dec 1922 Bishop Miguel Esteban HesayneBishop Emeritus of Viedma, Argentina
5 May 1923 Bishop Chucrallah HarbBishop Emeritus of Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon
6 May 1923 Archbishop Bruno ForestiBishop Emeritus of Brescia, Italy
9 Jun 1923 Bishop René Henry GracidaBishop Emeritus of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
24 Jul 1923 Albert Cardinal Vanhoye, S.J.Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Mercede e Sant’Adriano a Villa Albani
28 Aug 1923 Bishop Andrea VeggioAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Verona, Italy
6 Sep 1923 Bishop Eloy Tato Losada, I.E.M.E.Bishop Emeritus of Magangué, Colombia
28 Sep 1923 Archbishop Giuseppe CasaleArchbishop Emeritus of Foggia-Bovino, Italy
17 Oct 1923 Henryk Roman Cardinal GulbinowiczArchbishop Emeritus of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
26 Nov 1923 Bishop Luigi BettazziBishop Emeritus of Ivrea, Italy
29 Nov 1923 Bishop Augusto LauroBishop Emeritus of San Marco Argentano-Scalea, Italy
8 Dec 1923 Archbishop Manuel Vieira PintoArchbishop Emeritus of Nampula, Mozambique
9 Dec 1923 Bishop Jean Pierre Marie OrchamptBishop Emeritus of Angers, France
26 Jan 1924 Archbishop Stanisław SzymeckiArchbishop Emeritus of Białystok, Poland
24 Feb 1924 Bishop Remi Joseph De RooBishop Emeritus of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
11 Mar 1924 Jozef Cardinal TomkoPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses
18 Mar 1924 Alexandre José Maria Cardinal dos Santos, O.F.M.Archbishop Emeritus of Maputo, Mozambique
31 Mar 1924 Bishop Peter Takaaki HirayamaBishop Emeritus of Oita, Japan
7 Apr 1924 Bishop Manuel Cruz SobreviñasBishop Emeritus of Imus, Philippines
10 May 1924 Archbishop Settimio TodiscoArchbishop Emeritus of Brindisi-Ostuni, Italy
5 Jul 1924 Edward Idris Cardinal CassidyPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
31 Jul 1924 Bishop Daniel Alphonse Omer Verstraete, O.M.I.Bishop Emeritus of Klerksdorp, South Africa
13 Aug 1924 Serafim Cardinal Fernandes de AraújoArchbishop Emeritus of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
1 Oct 1924 Archbishop Stephen SulykArchbishop Emeritus of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
3 Oct 1924 Bishop Manuel Edmilson da CruzBishop Emeritus of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil
2 Nov 1924 Bishop Albert Jean Charles Ghislain HoussiauBishop Emeritus of Liège (Luik, Lüttich), Belgium
7 Nov 1924 Bishop Serafín Luis Alberto Cartagena Ocaña, O.F.M.Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zamora en Ecuador
8 Nov 1924 Archbishop Victorinus Youn Kong-hiArchbishop Emeritus of Gwangju, Korea (South)
17 Nov 1924 Bishop John Aloysius O’MaraBishop Emeritus of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
13 Dec 1924 Archbishop Gaetano BonicelliArchbishop Emeritus of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino, Italy
6 Jan 1925 Bishop Dante Frasnelli Tarter, O.S.I.Prelate Emeritus of Huarí, Peru
12 Jan 1925 Bishop Georges Marcel Émile Nicolas Perron, O.F.M. Cap.Bishop Emeritus of Djibouti
1 Mar 1925 Alexandre Cardinal do NascimentoArchbishop Emeritus of Luanda, Angola
7 Mar 1925 Bishop Guy Alexis HerbulotBishop Emeritus of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes, France
7 Mar 1925 Bishop João Evangelista Martins Terra, S.J.Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
28 Apr 1925 Archbishop James Hector MacDonald, C.S.C.Archbishop Emeritus of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
14 May 1925 Bishop José Mauro Ramalho de Alarcón SantiagoBishop Emeritus of Iguatú, Ceara, Brazil
16 May 1925 Archbishop Enzio d’AntonioArchbishop Emeritus of Lanciano-Ortona, Italy
18 May 1925 Archbishop Ignatius Paul PintoArchbishop Emeritus of Bangalore, India
10 Jul 1925 Bishop Ernest Bertrand Boland, O.P.Bishop Emeritus of Multan, Pakistan
11 Jul 1925 Bishop Paul Émile Joseph BertrandBishop Emeritus of Mende, France
14 Jul 1925 Francisco Cardinal Alvarez MartínezArchbishop Emeritus of Toledo, Spain
1 Sep 1925 Bishop Michael Joseph Cleary, C.S.Sp.Bishop Emeritus of Banjul, Gambia
5 Sep 1925 Bishop Patrick Leo McCartieBishop Emeritus of Northampton, England, Great Britain
16 Sep 1925 Bishop Joseph Gabriel FernandezBishop Emeritus of Quilon, India
23 Sep 1925 Archbishop Angelo AcerbiApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Netherlands
23 Sep 1925 Bishop Cândido Lorenzo González, O. de M.Bishop Emeritus of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil
30 Sep 1925 Bishop Joseph Habib HittiBishop Emeritus of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite), Australia
23 Oct 1925 José Cardinal Freire FalcãoArchbishop Emeritus of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
25 Oct 1925 Bishop John Joseph SnyderBishop Emeritus of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
1 Nov 1925 Bishop Arturo Lona ReyesBishop Emeritus of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca, México
1 Nov 1925 Bishop Didier-Léon MarchandBishop Emeritus of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
12 Nov 1925 Bishop Jaime Mota de FariasBishop Emeritus of Alagoinhas, Bahia, Brazil
21 Nov 1925 Bishop Jacques Marie Sébastien de Saint-BlanquatBishop Emeritus of Montauban, France
9 Dec 1925 Bishop Gerardo Humberto Flores ReyesBishop Emeritus of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala
11 Dec 1925 Bishop John Robert GormanAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chicago, Illinois, USA
24 Dec 1925 Prospero (Stanley) Cardinal Grech, O.S.A.Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Goretti
27 Jan 1926 Bishop Jacó (Jacob) Roberto HilgertBishop Emeritus of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
7 Feb 1926 Estanislao Esteban Cardinal KarlicArchbishop Emeritus of Paraná, Argentina
23 Feb 1926 Luigi Cardinal de MagistrisPro-Major Penitentiary Emeritus of the Apostolic Penitentiary
26 Feb 1926 Archbishop Gabino Díaz MerchánArchbishop Emeritus of Oviedo, Spain
22 Apr 1926 Archbishop Helímenas de Jesús Rojo Paredes, C.I.M.Archbishop Emeritus of Calabozo, Venezuela
27 Apr 1926 Bishop Franz Josef KuhnleAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany
5 May 1926 Bishop Maurice TaylorBishop Emeritus of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
8 May 1926 Bishop Walter Ivan de Azevedo, S.D.B.Bishop Emeritus of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil
12 May 1926 Bishop Desmond Charles Moore, M.S.C.Bishop Emeritus of Alotau-Sideia, Papua New Guinea
16 Jun 1926 Bishop Hildebrando Mendes CostaBishop Emeritus of Estância, Sergipe, Brazil
25 Jun 1926 Bishop Ján Eugen KočišProtosyncellus Emeritus of Czech Republic (Ruthenian)
4 Jul 1926 Bishop Jānis CakulsAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Riga, Latvia
12 Jul 1926 Bishop Emanuele CatarinicchiaBishop Emeritus of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
26 Jul 1926 Bishop James Chan Soon CheongBishop Emeritus of Melaka-Johor, Malaysia
29 Jul 1926 Archbishop Heitor de Araújo SalesArchbishop Emeritus of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
11 Aug 1926 Archbishop Pedro Antônio Marchetti FedaltoArchbishop Emeritus of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
14 Aug 1926 Agostino Cardinal CacciavillanPresident Emeritus of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
21 Aug 1926 Marian Cardinal JaworskiArchbishop Emeritus of Lviv, Ukraine
24 Aug 1926 Bishop Raúl Holguer López MayorgaBishop Emeritus of Latacunga, Ecuador
26 Aug 1926 Bishop Lawrence Donald SoensBishop Emeritus of Sioux City, Iowa, USA
30 Aug 1926 Bishop Juozas Žemaitis, M.I.C.Bishop Emeritus of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania
20 Sep 1926 Bishop Gilbert Ignatius SheldonBishop Emeritus of Steubenville, Ohio, USA
6 Oct 1926 Bishop Ernesto TogniBishop Emeritus of Lugano, Switzerland
2 Nov 1926 Archbishop Antonio CantisaniArchbishop Emeritus of Catanzaro-Squillace, Italy
21 Nov 1926 Bishop Domenico Crescentino Marinozzi, O.F.M. Cap.Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Soddo-Hosanna, Ethiopia
7 Dec 1926 Bishop William John McNaughton, M.M.Bishop Emeritus of Incheon {Inch’on}, Korea (South)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 Sep 2019

Quantcast