Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Corrientes

Archidioecesis Corrientensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Andrés Stanovnik, O.F.M. Cap., Archbishop
  • Domingo Salvador Castagna, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 April 1961
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 26,218 (10,126 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Calle Nueve de Julio 1543, Corrientes, Argentina
  • Telephone: (03783)42-2436
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Corrientes
21 January 1910ErectedDiocese of Paraná Diocese of Corrientes (erected)
11 February 1957Territory LostDiocese of Corrientes Diocese of Posadas (erected)
10 April 1961Territory LostDiocese of Corrientes Diocese of Goya (erected)
Archdiocese of Corrientes
10 April 1961ElevatedDiocese of Corrientes Archdiocese of Corrientes
3 July 1979Territory LostArchdiocese of Corrientes
Diocese of Goya
Diocese of Santo Tomé (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Corrientes
1950650,000850,00076.5%48701185,508658041ap1951
Archdiocese of Corrientes
1966298,000310,00096.1%3636724,138368725ap1967
1970300,000315,00095.2%3636724,1663910627ap1971
1976320,000325,00098.5%3136674,7761536537ap1977
1980245,000295,96482.8%2835633,888566735ap1981
1990461,000466,00098.9%6162220,9543283820ap1991
1999494,000506,00097.6%4627736,7677296534ap2000
2000506,000517,71897.7%4927766,6577376535ap2001
2001518,000530,31897.7%4827756,9067376541ap2002
2002480,000780,77861.5%494539,056876541ap2003
2003789,851929,23685.0%755809,873886541ap2004
2004865,820930,99193.0%6720879,95120226543ap2005
2006880,649946,93693.0%7620969,17321236449ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 5 Jul 2013