Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis María Niella

Deceased

Bishop of Corrientes, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1854Born
2 Feb 187924.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 191156.7AppointedBishop of Corrientes, Argentina
4 Jun 191157.1Ordained BishopBishop of Corrientes, Argentina
30 Nov 193379.5DiedBishop of Corrientes, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Luis María Niella
Bishop Luis María Niella (born , died ) Bishop of Corrientes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorrientes
Ordained BishopCorrientes, Diocese of Corrientes

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 45
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 36, Number 2,173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast