Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano José de Escalada Bustillo y Zeballos

Deceased

Archbishop of Buenos Aires


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1799BornBuenos Aires
2 Jul 183232.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
2 Jul 183232.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
21 Jun 183535.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
23 Jun 185454.6AppointedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
18 Nov 185556.0InstalledBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
5 Mar 186666.3AppointedArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
28 Jul 187070.7DiedArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Mariano José de Escalada Bustillo y Zeballos:
Archbishop Mariano José de Escalada Bustillo y Zeballos (born , died ) Archbishop of Buenos Aires

  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 566
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013