Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Santiago Rodríguez Zorrilla

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1752Born
23 Dec 177522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
15 Mar 181562.2AppointedBishop of Santiago de Chile
29 Jun 181562.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Chile
5 Apr 183279.2DiedBishop of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for José Santiago Rodríguez Zorrilla (VIAF: 292474929)
Bishop José Santiago Rodríguez Zorrilla (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Diocese of Santiago de Chile
Death PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Buried Place (Original)San Sebastian, Church, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Santiago, Diocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 219
  • c1/loc: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017