Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justo Donoso Vivanco

Deceased

Bishop of La Serena, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1800Born
23 Jul 181717.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
3 Nov 182222.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
1829¹28.4IncardinatedPriest of Santiago de Chile
3 Jul 184847.9AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
4 Feb 184948.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
10 Mar 185352.6AppointedBishop of La Serena, Chile
22 Feb 186867.5DiedBishop of La Serena, Chile

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Justo Donoso Vivanco (VIAF: 89046759)
Bishop Justo Donoso Vivanco (born , died ) Bishop of La Serena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago
Ordained BishopSt. Dominique, Santiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 183, and Page 513
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 8
  • prof/c1: CB, 9 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017